Magic Ved

# Instructions

• Click on each trick to expand and learn.
• Every trick has a Practice session with it. Check your answers right away.
• After learning all the tricks, Go for the Final test at the bottom to complete this level.
Multiply two digit number by 11
• Trick
• Practice

5 + 3 = 8

## Example 2 59 x 11 = 649

5 + 9 = 14

### Step 2 - Carry the 1 when the result is greater than 9

5 + 1 = 6

1. 16 x 11 =
2. 62 x 11 =
3. 84 x 11 =
1. 54 x 11 =
2. 76 x 11 =
3. 43 x 11 =
Square numbers ending in 5
• Trick
• Practice

## Example 1 85 x 85 = 7225

### Step 1 - Multiply the first digit by the first digit plus one:

8 x (8 + 1) = 8 x 9 = 72

## Example 2 45 x 45 = 2025

### Step 1 - Multiply the first digit by the first digit plus one:

4 x ( 4 + 1) = 4 x 5 = 20

### Step 2 - Write the number 25 next to the number from the first step:

1. 15 x 15 =
2. 65 x 65 =
3. 55 x 55 =
1. 25 x 25 =
2. 75 x 75 =
3. 35 x 35 =
Multiply two digit numbers having same tens digit and ones digits add up to 10
• Trick
• Practice

## Example 1 38 x 32 = 1216

### Step 1 - Multiply the first digit by the first digit plus one:

3 x (3 + 1) = 3 x 4 = 12

8 x 2 = 16

## Example 2 69 x 61 = 4209

### Step 1 - Multiply the first digit by the first digit plus one:

6 x (6 + 1) = 6 x 7 = 42

### Step 2 - Multiply the rightmost digits:

9 x 1 = 09 (if the result is a single digit put a 0 in front of it)

### Step 3 - Put the result from step 2 next to result from step 1:

1. 43 x 47 =
2. 24 x 26 =
3. 59 x 51 =
1. 23 x 27 =
2. 37 x 33 =
3. 94 x 96 =
Square numbers in the 50’s
• Trick
• Practice

25 + 8 = 33

8 x 8 = 64

## Example 2 54 x 54 = 2916

25 + 4 = 29

4 x 4 = 16

### Step 3 - Place the result from step 2 next to the result from step 1 :

1. 57 x 57 =
2. 59 x 59 =
3. 52 x 52 =
1. 51 x 51 =
2. 55 x 55 =
3. 58 x 58 =
Multiply even number by 5
• Trick
• Practice

242/2 = 121

112 / 2 = 56